TX SB213 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of individual graduation committees and other alternative methods to satisfy certain public high school graduation requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of individual graduation committees and other alternative methods to satisfy certain public high school graduation requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#662 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07 Effective immediately
2019-05-07 Signed by the Governor
2019-04-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-29HouseSigned in the House
2019-04-29SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-04-26SenateReported enrolled
2019-04-26SenateHouse passage reported
2019-04-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25HouseRecord vote RV#662
2019-04-25HousePassed
2019-04-25HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-24HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-04-24HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-24HouseLaid out in lieu of companion HB 851
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-09SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-04SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-02SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-20SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Education
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-12-04SenateFiled
2018-12-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB677 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Public Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback