TX SB2131 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the application for and loans from the Texas military value revolving loan account.
Title
Relating to the application for and loans from the Texas military value revolving loan account.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-05-28 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1361 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-10 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-08 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-08 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-08 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Vet Affairs & Border Security |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2119 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
LOANS
Military & Veterans
MILITARY PREPAREDNESS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Open Meetings
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Military & Veterans
MILITARY PREPAREDNESS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Open Meetings
PUBLIC FINANCE AUTHORITY, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions