TX SB2150 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-24 - House appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the reporting of certain information on maternal mortality to the Department of State Health Services and the confidentiality of that information.
Title
Relating to the reporting of certain information on maternal mortality to the Department of State Health Services and the confidentiality of that information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1673 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Amended RV#1596 (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Amended RV#1596 (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1673 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1596 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 2-Thierry |
2019-05-21 | House | Amendment tabled 1-Price |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably as amended |
2019-05-13 | House | Amendment(s) considered in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-08 | House | Meeting cancelled |
2019-05-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Health
Health--General
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
MIDLAND COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women
Health--General
MATERNAL MORTALITY & MORBIDITY TASK FORCE
MIDLAND COUNTY HOSPITAL DISTRICT
PREGNANCY & CHILDBIRTH
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Women