TX SB2168 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to relief from local matching funds requirements for certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to relief from local matching funds requirements for certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective immediately
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-19HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseNo action taken in committee
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2019-05-08HouseMeeting cancelled
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-16HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-04-16HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-09SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-04SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-04SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback