TX SB2180 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum and the establishment of a computer science strategic advisory committee to increase computer science instruction and participation in public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the essential knowledge and skills of the technology applications curriculum and the establishment of a computer science strategic advisory committee to increase computer science instruction and participation in public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-07HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-07HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-07HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-07HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Education
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback