TX SB2195 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-16 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to metering and billing requirements for certain apartment houses, manufactured homes, and recreational vehicles.
Title
Relating to metering and billing requirements for certain apartment houses, manufactured homes, and recreational vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Housing
Housing--General
Housing--Manufactured Housing
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--General
Housing--General
Housing--Manufactured Housing
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--General