TX SB2200 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Health and Human Services Commission to obtain criminal history record information.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Health and Human Services Commission to obtain criminal history record information.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] | Rep. John Turner [D] | Rep. Sarah Davis [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
Rep. Philip Cortez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1433 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1433 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-16 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-16 | House | Record vote RV#1433 |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-15 | House | Amended 1-J. Turner |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3699 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
CRIMINAL RECORDS
Electronic Information Systems
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--General
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Electronic Information Systems
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
Human Services
Human Services--General
JUDICIAL BRANCH CERTIFICATION COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS