TX SB2212 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the maintenance and operation of certain projects by certain drainage districts.
Title
Relating to the maintenance and operation of certain projects by certain drainage districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1559 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1559 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1559 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-20 | House | Amended 1-Paul |
2019-05-20 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 8, Section 10(b) |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Taylor |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4293 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
JEFFERSON COUNTY DRAINAGE DISTRICT NO.7
ORANGE COUNTY DRAINAGE DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
VELASCO DRAINAGE DISTRICT
ORANGE COUNTY DRAINAGE DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
VELASCO DRAINAGE DISTRICT