TX SB2254 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-09 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Pending: House Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to creation of magistrates in Fort Bend County.
Title
Relating to creation of magistrates in Fort Bend County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
FORT BEND COUNTY
MAGISTRATES
County Government--Employees/Officers
Courts
Courts--County & Statutory
Courts--District
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
FORT BEND COUNTY
MAGISTRATES