TX SB2271 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to compensation under the Crime Victims' Compensation Act for certain expenses.
Title
Relating to compensation under the Crime Victims' Compensation Act for certain expenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2079 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Crime Victims Compensation
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Crime Victims Compensation
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--General
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against