TX SB230 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a landowner's liability for injuries incurred during certain recreational activities.
Title
Relating to a landowner's liability for injuries incurred during certain recreational activities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1661 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1661 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-28 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-28 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB687 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately