TX SB2318 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to County Affairs
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to County Affairs
Pending: House County Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a county to require a person to obtain a building permit from the county for certain portable structures.
Title
Relating to the authority of a county to require a person to obtain a building permit from the county for certain portable structures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-05-07 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-01 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Campbell |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
County Government
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--General
County Government--Land Use & Zoning