TX SB2333 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of the Texas Title Insurance Guaranty Association.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of the Texas Title Insurance Guaranty Association.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15SenateRemoved from local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-15SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-06SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-04SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1614 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback