TX SB2346 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Sam Houston State University College of Osteopathic Medicine.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Sam Houston State University College of Osteopathic Medicine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2867 (Same As) 2019-05-29 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY
SAM HOUSTON STATE UNIVERSITY COLLEGE OF OSTEOPATHIC MEDICINE
TEXAS STATE UNIVERSITY SYSTEM
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB2346 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB02346I.htm |