TX SB2353 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a fund to assist local governments with the acquisition of voting system equipment.
Title
Relating to the creation of a fund to assist local governments with the acquisition of voting system equipment.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB362 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Elections
Elections--Voting Systems
Legislature
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Elections
Elections--Voting Systems
Legislature
SECRETARY OF STATE
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control