TX SB2354 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to judicial review of acts by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to judicial review of acts by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-07HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2019-05-07HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback