TX SB24 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of informational materials and certain other information to a pregnant woman before an abortion.
Title
Relating to the provision of informational materials and certain other information to a pregnant woman before an abortion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1531 (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1520 (Y: 83 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1520 (Y: 83 N: 60 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-21 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Record vote RV#1531 |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1520 |
2019-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | House | Amendment withdrawn 1-Ramos |
2019-05-20 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-20 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Ramos |
2019-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-20 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4240 (Similar To) 2019-03-25 - Referred to Public Health