TX SB2431 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-08 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a committee to recommend a framework to incorporate digital teaching and learning in public schools.
Title
Relating to the creation of a committee to recommend a framework to incorporate digital teaching and learning in public schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4186 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Received from the House
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
NEXT GENERATION COMMISSION ON DIGITAL LEARNING
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Governor
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
NEXT GENERATION COMMISSION ON DIGITAL LEARNING
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE