TX SB2480 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to House Administration
Pending: House Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the establishment of the Medicaid Waiver Legislative Oversight Committee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the establishment of the Medicaid Waiver Legislative Oversight Committee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseReferred to House Administration
2019-05-07HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-03SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenatePassed
2019-05-03SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-03SenateRecord vote
2019-05-03SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-03SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-03SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-05-03SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-27SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-27SenateRead first time
2019-03-27SenatePermission to introduce
2019-03-26SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback