TX SB25 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eliminating the wrongful birth cause of action.
Title
Relating to eliminating the wrongful birth cause of action.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Passed |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-21 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |