TX SB2531 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 1/1/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 1/1/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of an ad valorem tax protest by means of an agreed order.
Title
Relating to the disposition of an ad valorem tax protest by means of an agreed order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 1/1/20 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1608 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-15 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-26 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts