TX SB2552 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the administration of the Agua Special Utility District; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the administration of the Agua Special Utility District; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1608 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-25SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-25HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-25SenateRecord vote
2019-05-25SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-25SenateRead
2019-05-25SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-23SenateRecommendations filed with the Senate
2019-05-22SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HouseRecord vote RV#1608
2019-05-22HousePassed
2019-05-22HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-22HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-22HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-20HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-17HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-15HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-09HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2019-05-09HouseRead first time
2019-05-08HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-08SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenatePassed
2019-05-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-08SenateRecord vote
2019-05-08SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-08SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-08SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-08SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-07SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-29SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-04-23SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2019-04-22SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback