TX SB2553 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Save Historic Muny District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose fees.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Save Historic Muny District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1619 (Y: 104 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1619 (Y: 104 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1619 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Howard |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-16 | House | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Corrected comm. report distributed |
2019-05-15 | House | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-08 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUSTIN, CITY OF
SAVE HISTORIC MUNY DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
SAVE HISTORIC MUNY DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous