TX SB27 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the online broadcast of open meetings of institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to the online broadcast of open meetings of institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-27 - House - SB 27Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed |
2015-05-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-27 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-26 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-05-18 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-05-15 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-14 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-14 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred to Government Transparency & Operation |
2015-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Higher Education |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Filed |
2014-11-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
INTERNET
Open Meetings
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Higher--Institutions & Programs
INTERNET
Open Meetings