TX SB27 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to recovery of damages, attorney's fees, and costs related to frivolous claims and regulatory actions by state agencies.
Title
Relating to recovery of damages, attorney's fees, and costs related to frivolous claims and regulatory actions by state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1365 (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1365 (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-14 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1365 |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-29 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-04-10 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-09 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3936 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
Subjects
ATTORNEY'S FEES
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Admin. Procedure