TX SB279 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to completion and submission of a financial aid application for costs of higher education as a condition of high school graduation for public school students.
Title
Relating to completion and submission of a financial aid application for costs of higher education as a condition of high school graduation for public school students.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Filed |
2018-12-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB535 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Admission & Attendance
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB279 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00279I.htm |