TX SB285 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to information, outreach, and other actions regarding hurricane preparedness and mitigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to information, outreach, and other actions regarding hurricane preparedness and mitigation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1361 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1361
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-05-05HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-04-08HouseRead first time
2019-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenatePassed
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-03SenateFiled
2019-01-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3418 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback