TX SB286 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the power of certain counties to enact certain park use rules.
Title
Relating to the power of certain counties to enact certain park use rules.
Sponsors
Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-29 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB200 (Same As) 2019-04-18 - Companion considered in lieu of in committee
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Safety
Safety--Fireworks
County Government--General
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
Safety
Safety--Fireworks