TX SB288 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the authority of a county assistance district to impose a sales and use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the authority of a county assistance district to impose a sales and use tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-29HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-25SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenatePassed
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-25SenateRecord vote
2019-04-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-03SenateFiled
2019-01-03SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB203 (Same As) 2019-02-19 - Referred to Ways & Means

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback