TX SB29 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 46-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-20 - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use by a political subdivision of public money for lobbying and certain other activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use by a political subdivision of public money for lobbying and certain other activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-20 - House - Failed to pass to 3rd reading RV#1519 (Y: 58 N: 85 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - House - 9-Capriglione RV#1518 (Y: 133 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1517 (Y: 62 N: 80 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment adopted as amended RV#1516 (Y: 81 N: 59 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment amended RV#1515 (Y: 126 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment amended RV#1514 (Y: 90 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1519
2019-05-20HouseFailed to pass to 3rd reading
2019-05-20HouseAmendment withdrawn 11-S. Davis
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1518
2019-05-20HouseAmended 10-Moody
2019-05-20HouseAmended 9-Capriglione
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1517
2019-05-20HouseAmendment fails of adoption 8-Ramos
2019-05-20HouseAmendment withdrawn 7-Dutton
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1516
2019-05-20HouseAmendment adopted as amended 1-Middleton
2019-05-20HouseAmendment to amendment withdrawn 6-Lucio
2019-05-20HouseAmendment to amendment withdrawn 5-Wray
2019-05-20HouseAmendment to amendment withdrawn 4-Hinojosa
2019-05-20HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-20HouseAmendment to amendment offered 4-Hinojosa
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1515
2019-05-20HouseAmendment amended 3-Moody
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1514
2019-05-20HouseAmendment amended 2-Ashby
2019-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Middleton
2019-05-20HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2); Article I, Section 16
2019-05-20HousePoint of order overruled Rule 4, Section 32(c)
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-17HouseRecommitted to committee
2019-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-29HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-29HouseRead first time
2019-04-17HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-16SenateRecord vote
2019-04-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-04SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-07SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB281 (Similar To) 2019-04-11 - Considered in Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB29
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00029I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00029S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00029E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00029H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-16-F.PDF#page=22
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-17-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB29&RcdVtNo=1514&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB29&RcdVtNo=1515&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB29&RcdVtNo=1516&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB29&RcdVtNo=1517&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB29&RcdVtNo=1518&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB29&RcdVtNo=1519&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019

Bill Comments

feedback