TX SB296 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the abolition of student loan default or breach of a student loan repayment or scholarship contract as a ground for nonrenewal or other disciplinary action in relation to a professional or occupational license and to certain duties of state agencies and political subdivisions in relation to delinquent or defaulted student loans.
Title
Relating to the abolition of student loan default or breach of a student loan repayment or scholarship contract as a ground for nonrenewal or other disciplinary action in relation to a professional or occupational license and to certain duties of state agencies and political subdivisions in relation to delinquent or defaulted student loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB846 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Referred to Higher Education
HB218 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Received from the House
HB218 (Similar To) 2019-04-16 - Received from the House
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STUDENT LOANS
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Finance
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
STUDENT LOANS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB296 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00296I.htm |