TX SB300 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to indefinite quantity contracts for the provision of certain services to declared disaster areas following a natural disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to indefinite quantity contracts for the provision of certain services to declared disaster areas following a natural disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#1394 (Y: 139 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1394
2019-05-15HousePassed
2019-05-15HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-04-08HouseRead first time
2019-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenatePassed
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenateAmended
2019-04-04SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Miles
2019-04-04SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-26SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-03-25SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-25SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-25SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-04SenateFiled
2019-01-04SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3419 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback