TX SB31 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing a guardianship abuse, fraud, and exploitation deterrence program.
Title
Relating to establishing a guardianship abuse, fraud, and exploitation deterrence program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1468 (Y: 140 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-14 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-17 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-17 | House | Record vote RV#1468 |
2019-05-17 | House | Passed |
2019-05-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-16 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-04-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Filed |
2018-11-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1286 (Same As) 2019-04-15 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Courts
Courts--General
FRAUD
GUARDIANS & WARDS
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Courts
Courts--General
FRAUD
GUARDIANS & WARDS
Probate
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts