TX SB311 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the frequency and location of certain meetings required by a prescriptive authority agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the frequency and location of certain meetings required by a prescriptive authority agreement.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-07SenateFiled
2019-01-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB278 (Same As) 2019-05-16 - Effective on 9/1/19

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback