TX SB312 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the sale of ale and beer by certain brewers and manufacturers to ultimate consumers for consumption off the brewers' or manufacturers' premises.
Title
Relating to the sale of ale and beer by certain brewers and manufacturers to ultimate consumers for consumption off the brewers' or manufacturers' premises.
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Buckingham [R] | Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Sen. Peter Flores [R] |
Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Robert Nichols [R] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB672 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB312 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00312I.htm |