TX SB322 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the evaluation and reporting of investment practices and performance of certain public retirement systems.
Title
Relating to the evaluation and reporting of investment practices and performance of certain public retirement systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1656 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1656 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-24 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1656 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-17 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1887 (Same As) 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
INTERNET
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Teachers
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD
Retirement Systems
Retirement Systems--General
Retirement Systems--Municipal
Retirement Systems--Teachers
STATE PENSION REVIEW BOARD