TX SB327 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 24 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-17 - Co-author authorized

Summary

Relating to a business's duty to protect sensitive personal information contained in its customer records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a business's duty to protect sensitive personal information contained in its customer records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-17 Co-author authorized
2009-02-11 Referred to Business & Commerce
2009-02-11 Read first time
2008-11-24 Filed
2008-11-24 Received by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB345 (Same As) 2009-05-14 - Placed on General State Calendar

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback