TX SB327 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to termination of franchises to provide cable or video service in municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to termination of franchises to provide cable or video service in municipalities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-05-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-05-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-05-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-05-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-05-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-13HousePosting rule suspended
2013-05-08HouseReferred to State Affairs
2013-05-08HouseRead first time
2013-03-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-03-13SenateReported engrossed
2013-03-13SenateRecord vote
2013-03-13SenatePassed
2013-03-13SenateRead 3rd time
2013-03-13SenateRecord vote
2013-03-13SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-03-13SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-03-13SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-03-13SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-03-13SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-02-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-02-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-02-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-02-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-02-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-05SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2013-02-05SenateRead first time
2013-01-31SenateFiled
2013-01-31SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback