TX SB335 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to community land trusts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to community land trusts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-19HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-15HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-14HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2019-04-24HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-11SenateFiled
2019-01-11SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback