TX SB346 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the consolidation, allocation, classification, and repeal of certain criminal court costs and other court-related costs, fines, and fees; imposing certain court costs and fees and increasing and decreasing the amounts of certain other court costs and fees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the consolidation, allocation, classification, and repeal of certain criminal court costs and other court-related costs, fines, and fees; imposing certain court costs and fees and increasing and decreasing the amounts of certain other court costs and fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-02HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-02HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-02HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-29HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-29HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-29HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-29HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-16SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-10SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-10SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-30SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-14SenateFiled
2019-01-14SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback