TX SB364 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to policies on the recess period in public schools.
Title
Relating to policies on the recess period in public schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] |
Rep. Michelle Beckley [D] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] | Rep. James Talarico [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-04-12 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB455 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF