TX SB366 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the content of detailed reports filed by lobbyists and to monetary limits on expenditures by lobbyists.
Title
Relating to the content of detailed reports filed by lobbyists and to monetary limits on expenditures by lobbyists.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-04-01 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-27 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Passed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3447 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Left pending in committee