TX SB370 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to employment protections for jury service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to employment protections for jury service.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1366 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-15HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-15SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-14SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-14SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1366
2019-05-14HousePassed
2019-05-14HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-13HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-13HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-06HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-06HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-23HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-23HouseRead first time
2019-04-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-17SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenatePassed
2019-04-17SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-17SenateRecord vote
2019-04-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-17SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-08SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-08SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-04SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateMeeting cancelled
2019-03-21SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-16SenateFiled
2019-01-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3449 (Same As) 2019-04-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback