TX SB38 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the offense of hazing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the offense of hazing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-15 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-15 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-19SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1508
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1507
2019-05-17HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-17HouseAmended 3-Springer
2019-05-17HouseAmended 2-Lozano
2019-05-17HouseAmended 1-Lozano
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-25HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-15HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-04-15HouseRead first time
2019-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-11SenateRemarks ordered printed
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed
2019-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-11SenateAmended
2019-04-11SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2019-04-11SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-11SenateRecord vote
2019-04-11SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-01SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-12SenateFiled
2018-11-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1482 (Same As) 2019-04-05 - Considered in Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB38
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00038I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00038S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00038E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00038H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00038F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-11-F1.PDF#page=33
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-11-F1.PDF#page=34
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB38&RcdVtNo=1507&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB38&RcdVtNo=1508&Ch=H&Dt=05/17/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=6

Bill Comments

feedback