TX SB390 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Northeast Houston Redevelopment District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Northeast Houston Redevelopment District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-10HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-10HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2019-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-08HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-08HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-05-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07HousePosting rule suspended
2019-05-06HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-04-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-26SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenatePassed
2019-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-26SenateRecord vote
2019-04-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2019-04-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-18SenateRecommendations filed with the Senate
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-21SenateTransmitted to the Governor
2019-01-18SenateFiled
2019-01-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback