TX SB406 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-01 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the carrying or storage of a handgun by a school marshal.
Title
Relating to the carrying or storage of a handgun by a school marshal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-01 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-01 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2019-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2608 (Same As) 2019-03-11 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Subjects
CONCEALED HANDGUNS
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Safety
Weapons
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Safety
Weapons