TX SB418 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with an intellectual disability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the applicability of the death penalty to a capital offense committed by a person with an intellectual disability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-26SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-23SenateFiled
2019-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1139 (Same As) 2019-05-24 - Senate appoints conferees-reported

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback