TX SB426 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the use of public school counselors' work time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the use of public school counselors' work time.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-16HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-06HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-05-06HouseRead first time
2019-05-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-02SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenatePassed
2019-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-05-02SenateRecord vote
2019-05-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-23SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Education
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-01-23SenateFiled
2019-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB727 (Same As) 2019-04-23 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback