TX SB436 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to statewide initiatives to improve maternal and newborn health for women with opioid use disorder.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to statewide initiatives to improve maternal and newborn health for women with opioid use disorder.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1508 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1507 (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-07 Effective immediately
2019-06-07 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-19SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-19SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-17HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1508
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1507
2019-05-17HouseConstitutional three day rule suspended
2019-05-17HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-17HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-10HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-01HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-01HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-05-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-01HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-12HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-04-12HouseRead first time
2019-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-10SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenatePassed
2019-04-10SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-10SenateRecord vote
2019-04-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-10SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-10SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-04SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-02-14SenateRead first time
2019-02-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-01-23SenateFiled
2019-01-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1292 (Same As) 2019-02-27 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback