TX SB451 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-13 - Referred to Public Education
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the permissible uses of the bilingual education allotment provided under the foundation school program.
Title
Relating to the permissible uses of the bilingual education allotment provided under the foundation school program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-07 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
Education--Bilingual
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Salaries & Expenses
Education--Bilingual
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Salaries & Expenses